Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Contests

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0070 (SB0151)
Title
State Board of Nursing - Disciplinary Process and Authority - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0211 /CH0398 (SB0268/CH0399)
Title
Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1382 /CH0439 (SB1121/CH0440)
Title
Election Law - Candidate for Circuit Court Judge Defeated in Primary Election
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0151 (HB0070)
Title
State Board of Nursing - Disciplinary Process and Authority - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268 /CH0399 (HB0211/CH0398)
Title
Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0517 /CH0614 (HB0628/CH0613)
Title
Secretaries of Principal Departments - Supervision and Review of Decisions and Actions by Units Within Departments
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0070 (SB0151) State Board of Nursing - Disciplinary Process and Authority - Revisions Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0211 /CH0398 (SB0268/CH0399) Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests Delegate Robinson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1382 /CH0439 (SB1121/CH0440) Election Law - Candidate for Circuit Court Judge Defeated in Primary Election Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Judicial Proceedings
SB0151 (HB0070) State Board of Nursing - Disciplinary Process and Authority - Revisions Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0268 /CH0399 (HB0211/CH0398) Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0517 /CH0614 (HB0628/CH0613) Secretaries of Principal Departments - Supervision and Review of Decisions and Actions by Units Within Departments Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM