Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Continuing Care -see also- Long-Term Care; Nursing Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0189
Title
Hospitals - Substance Use Treatment Demonstration Program - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0411 (SB0418)
Title
State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Installation at Large Continuing Care Retirement Communities
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794 (SB0419)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Stella Maris Transitional Care Center
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0953 /CH0213 (SB0696/CH0212)
Title
Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1083 /CH0028 (SB1081/CH0810)
Title
Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1613 (SB0876)
Title
Individuals With Disabilities - Establishing Community-Based Long-Term Services and Supports (Maryland Disability Integration Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418 (HB0411)
Title
State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Installation at Large Continuing Care Retirement Communities
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0419 (HB0794)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Stella Maris Transitional Care Center
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0696 /CH0212 (HB0953/CH0213)
Title
Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876 (HB1613)
Title
Individuals With Disabilities - Establishing Community-Based Long-Term Services and Supports (Maryland Disability Integration Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0903
Title
Health and Aging Programs - Establishment and Funding Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1081 /CH0810 (HB1083/CH0028)
Title
Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0189 Hospitals - Substance Use Treatment Demonstration Program - Requirements Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0411 (SB0418) State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Installation at Large Continuing Care Retirement Communities Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0794 (SB0419) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Stella Maris Transitional Care Center Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 10:00 AM
HB0953 /CH0213 (SB0696/CH0212) Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1083 /CH0028 (SB1081/CH0810) Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1613 (SB0876) Individuals With Disabilities - Establishing Community-Based Long-Term Services and Supports (Maryland Disability Integration Act) Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0418 (HB0411) State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Installation at Large Continuing Care Retirement Communities Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0419 (HB0794) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Stella Maris Transitional Care Center Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0696 /CH0212 (HB0953/CH0213) Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0876 (HB1613) Individuals With Disabilities - Establishing Community-Based Long-Term Services and Supports (Maryland Disability Integration Act) Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0903 Health and Aging Programs - Establishment and Funding Requirements Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Budget and Taxation
SB1081 /CH0810 (HB1083/CH0028) Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care Senator Madaleno 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 810
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM