Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Continuing Care -see also- Long-Term Care; Nursing Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071
Title
Program of All-Inclusive Care for the Elderly ("PACE") - Limit on Number of Providers - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0245 /CH0230 (SB0802)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344 (SB0425)
Title
Continuing Care Agreements - Termination - Notice and Contractual Entrance Fee Refunds
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0375
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0425 (HB0344)
Title
Continuing Care Agreements - Termination - Notice and Contractual Entrance Fee Refunds
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0802 (HB0245/CH0230)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License
Sponsor
Senator Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0071 Program of All-Inclusive Care for the Elderly ("PACE") - Limit on Number of Providers - Prohibition Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0245 /CH0230 (SB0802) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0344 (SB0425) Continuing Care Agreements - Termination - Notice and Contractual Entrance Fee Refunds Delegate Jones 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0375 Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0425 (HB0344) Continuing Care Agreements - Termination - Notice and Contractual Entrance Fee Refunds Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0802 (HB0245/CH0230) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License Senator Oaks 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM