Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Conventions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0002 (SJ0002)
Title
United States Constitution - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0002 (HJ0002)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HJ0002 (SJ0002) United States Constitution - Democracy Amendment Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SJ0002 (HJ0002) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM