Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Conventions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0084
Title
Constitutional Convention - Approval by Majority of Voters Voting on the Question - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0801 (SB0991)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Ocean City Convention Center Phase 3
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1030 (SB0846/CH0597)
Title
Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion and Operations
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0002 /JR0003 (SJ0002/JR0002)
Title
Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0006 (SJ0004)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate Gaines
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0846 /CH0597 (HB1030)
Title
Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion and Operations
Sponsor
Senator Conway
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0991 (HB0801)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Ocean City Convention Center Phase 3
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0004 (HJ0006)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0084 Constitutional Convention - Approval by Majority of Voters Voting on the Question - Requirement Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0801 (SB0991) Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Ocean City Convention Center Phase 3 Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 AM
HB1030 (SB0846/CH0597) Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion and Operations Delegate Anderson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Ways and Means
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HJ0002 /JR0003 (SJ0002/JR0002) Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal Delegate Frick 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HJ0006 (SJ0004) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Delegate Gaines 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0846 /CH0597 (HB1030) Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion and Operations Senator Conway 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0991 (HB0801) Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Ocean City Convention Center Phase 3 Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
SJ0004 (HJ0006) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM