Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Conventions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0801 /CH0695 (SB0799)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Baltimore Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1192 /CH0336 (SB1014/CH0337)
Title
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0799 (HB0801/CH0695)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Baltimore Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1014 /CH0337 (HB1192/CH0336)
Title
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0801 /CH0695 (SB0799) Maryland Stadium Authority - Baltimore Convention Facility - Renovation Delegate Glenn 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 695
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1192 /CH0336 (SB1014/CH0337) Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Appropriations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0414 Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0799 (HB0801/CH0695) Maryland Stadium Authority - Baltimore Convention Facility - Renovation Senator Hayes 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1014 /CH0337 (HB1192/CH0336) Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement Senator Patterson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:21 PM