Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cooperative Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576 (SB0794)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0811
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure of Liens by Common Ownership Communities
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 (HB0576)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0576 (SB0794) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0811 Residential Property - Foreclosure of Liens by Common Ownership Communities Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0794 (HB0576) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM