Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cooperative Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0414 (SB0724)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0527 /CH0370 (SB0290/CH0371)
Title
Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737 (SB0721)
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0900
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0290 /CH0371 (HB0527/CH0370)
Title
Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0721 (HB0737)
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Registration
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0724 (HB0414)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0414 (SB0724) Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures Delegate Healey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0527 /CH0370 (SB0290/CH0371) Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0737 (SB0721) Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Registration Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0900 Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0290 /CH0371 (HB0527/CH0370) Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Finance
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0721 (HB0737) Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Registration Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0724 (HB0414) Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:21 PM