Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Correction, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0269
Title
Pretrial Release, Parole, and Probation - Marijuana - Urinalyses
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 (SB1005/CH0515)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0783
Title
Correctional Education Council - Adult Correctional Institutions - Study of Access to the Internet and Higher Education Courses (Raising Education Attainment)
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1111
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0269 Pretrial Release, Parole, and Probation - Marijuana - Urinalyses Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1312 (SB1005/CH0515) Justice Reinvestment Act Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
SB0783 Correctional Education Council - Adult Correctional Institutions - Study of Access to the Internet and Higher Education Courses (Raising Education Attainment) Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312) Justice Reinvestment Act President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
SB1111 Correctional Services - Inmate Savings Accounts Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page