Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Correction, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0291 /CH0144 (SB1137/CH0145)
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Case Record - Educational, Vocational, and Job History
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 (SB1113)
Title
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0628
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797 /CH0254 (SB0598/CH0255)
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Menstrual Hygiene Products
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1160
Title
Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255
Title
Correctional Services - Retired Officer Identification Card
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0237
Title
Adult Correctional Institutions – Financial Literacy and Entrepreneurship Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0598 /CH0255 (HB0797/CH0254)
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Menstrual Hygiene Products
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1113 (HB0295)
Title
Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1137 /CH0145 (HB0291/CH0144)
Title
Criminal Law - Prohibitions, Prosecutions, and Corrections
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0291 /CH0144 (SB1137/CH0145) Correctional Services - Inmate Case Record - Educational, Vocational, and Job History Delegate Queen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0295 (SB1113) Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0628 Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0797 /CH0254 (SB0598/CH0255) Correctional Services - Inmates - Menstrual Hygiene Products Delegate Queen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1160 Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1255 Correctional Services - Retired Officer Identification Card Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0237 Adult Correctional Institutions – Financial Literacy and Entrepreneurship Pilot Program Senator Robinson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0598 /CH0255 (HB0797/CH0254) Correctional Services - Inmates - Menstrual Hygiene Products Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1113 (HB0295) Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1137 /CH0145 (HB0291/CH0144) Criminal Law - Prohibitions, Prosecutions, and Corrections Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM