Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cosmetologists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0250 /CH0256
Title
State Board of Barbers and State Board of Cosmetologists - Special Fund and Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0501
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Barber and Cosmetology Professionals - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Education
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538 /CH0289
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1261 /CH0198
Title
Barbers - Criminal Penalties for Violations of Barbering Law - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1600 /CH0784
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - License Renewal - Continuing Education
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0417
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment for Nail Technicians - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1030
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensing and License Renewal - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Course
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0250 /CH0256 State Board of Barbers and State Board of Cosmetologists - Special Fund and Fees Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Economic Matters
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0501 Business Occupations and Professions - Barber and Cosmetology Professionals - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Education Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0538 /CH0289 St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1261 /CH0198 Barbers - Criminal Penalties for Violations of Barbering Law - Repeal Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Economic Matters
3/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1600 /CH0784 State Board of Cosmetologists - License Renewal - Continuing Education Delegate Jones 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 784
Economic Matters
4/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0417 Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment for Nail Technicians - Repeal Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1030 State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensing and License Renewal - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Course Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM