Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Country Clubs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045 (SB0122)
Title
Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0874
Title
Montgomery County - Country Clubs and Golf Courses - Annual Land Preservation Fee MC 16-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1354
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Services
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122 (HB0045)
Title
Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 (SB0122) Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:15 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2020 - 1:15 PM
HB0874 Montgomery County - Country Clubs and Golf Courses - Annual Land Preservation Fee MC 16-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1354 Sales and Use Tax - Services Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0122 (HB0045) Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/15/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/12/2020 11:26 AM