Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

County Administrators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0309 /CH0070
Title
Anne Arundel County - Practice of Massage - Regulation
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0968 /CH0397 (SB0092/CH0398)
Title
Maryland School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1742
Title
Railroad Companies - Magnetic Levitation (MAGLEV) Projects - County Approval
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092 /CH0398 (HB0968/CH0397)
Title
Public School Construction – Innovation Incentive Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924 /CH0234 (HB1217/CH0235)
Title
Local Government – Splash Pads – Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0309 /CH0070 Anne Arundel County - Practice of Massage - Regulation Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0968 /CH0397 (SB0092/CH0398) Maryland School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2018 Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Appropriations
2/15/2018 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1742 Railroad Companies - Magnetic Levitation (MAGLEV) Projects - County Approval Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0092 /CH0398 (HB0968/CH0397) Public School Construction – Innovation Incentive Pilot Program Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2018 - 2:30 PM
Appropriations
4/09/2018 - 11:00 AM
SB0924 /CH0234 (HB1217/CH0235) Local Government – Splash Pads – Regulations Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM