Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

County and Baltimore City Bonds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 /CH0108
Title
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0331 /CH0109
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0609 /CH0089 (SB0360)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1102 /CH0115
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority - Enterprise Fund
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1321 /CH0099 (SB0889)
Title
Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Delegate Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1354 /CH0117
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1767 (SB1188)
Title
Wireless Facilities – Permitting and Siting
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360 (HB0609/CH0089)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0889 (HB1321/CH0099)
Title
Washington County – Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1188 (HB1767)
Title
Wireless Facilities - Permitting and Siting
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0275 /CH0108 St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0331 /CH0109 St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0609 /CH0089 (SB0360) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1102 /CH0115 Calvert County - Bonding Authority - Enterprise Fund Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1321 /CH0099 (SB0889) Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds Delegate Corderman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1354 /CH0117 Calvert County - Bonding Authority Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1767 (SB1188) Wireless Facilities – Permitting and Siting Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0360 (HB0609/CH0089) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0889 (HB1321/CH0099) Washington County – Public Facilities Bonds Washington County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB1188 (HB1767) Wireless Facilities - Permitting and Siting Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM