Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

County Commissioners

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323 /CH0195 (SB0336/CH0194)
Title
Somerset County - Commissioners - Residency Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0359 /CH0181
Title
St. Mary's County - Building Authority Commission - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 /CH0119 (SB0217/CH0120)
Title
Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623 /CH0096
Title
Calvert County - Local Debt Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217 /CH0120 (HB0407/CH0119)
Title
Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0336 /CH0194 (HB0323/CH0195)
Title
Somerset County - Commissioners - Residency Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0973
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Membership and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0323 /CH0195 (SB0336/CH0194) Somerset County - Commissioners - Residency Requirements Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0359 /CH0181 St. Mary's County - Building Authority Commission - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0407 /CH0119 (SB0217/CH0120) Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Judiciary
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0623 /CH0096 Calvert County - Local Debt Bonding Authority Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0217 /CH0120 (HB0407/CH0119) Garrett County - Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0336 /CH0194 (HB0323/CH0195) Somerset County - Commissioners - Residency Requirements Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0973 Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Membership and Funding Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:21 PM