Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

County Councils

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0030
Title
Frederick County Public Charter School Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0145 /CH0072
Title
Howard County - Appointed Alcoholic Beverage Hearing Board - Compensation Ho. Co. 6-15
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246 /CH0232 (SB0503)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice for License Applications, Fees, and Inspectors
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0274 /CH0234 (SB0510)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Events
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0425 /CH0246
Title
Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 7-15
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0594
Title
Prince George's County - New School Construction Investment Act of 2015 PG 413-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0628
Title
Prince George's County - Municipal Zoning Authority MC/PG 111-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0634 /CH0445
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Authority to Establish a Certified County-Based Business Participation Program PG 408-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935 /CH0289
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 410-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0938 (SB0564/CH0365)
Title
Prince George's County - Maryland-Washington Regional District - Fairness in Zoning MC/PG 112-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0973
Title
Local AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1016
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Certified County-Based Business Participation Program MC/PG 113-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1152
Title
Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1180 (SB0831)
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0503 (HB0246/CH0232)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice for License Applications, Fees, and Inspectors
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0510 (HB0274/CH0234)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Events
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0564 /CH0365 (HB0938)
Title
Prince George's County - Maryland-Washington Regional District - Fairness in Zoning
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0623
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0831 (HB1180)
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Baltimore County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939
Title
Prince George's County - Maintenance of Effort - Property Tax Rate
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0030 Frederick County Public Charter School Program - Establishment Delegate Schulz 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Ways and Means
HB0145 /CH0072 Howard County - Appointed Alcoholic Beverage Hearing Board - Compensation Ho. Co. 6-15 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0246 /CH0232 (SB0503) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice for License Applications, Fees, and Inspectors Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0255 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0274 /CH0234 (SB0510) Frederick County - Gaming Events Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0425 /CH0246 Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 7-15 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0594 Prince George's County - New School Construction Investment Act of 2015 PG 413-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0628 Prince George's County - Municipal Zoning Authority MC/PG 111-15 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0634 /CH0445 Prince George's County Board of Education - Authority to Establish a Certified County-Based Business Participation Program PG 408-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0935 /CH0289 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 410-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0938 (SB0564/CH0365) Prince George's County - Maryland-Washington Regional District - Fairness in Zoning MC/PG 112-15 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0973 Local AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Programs Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1016 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Certified County-Based Business Participation Program MC/PG 113-15 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1152 Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1180 (SB0831) Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Baltimore County Delegation 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0503 (HB0246/CH0232) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice for License Applications, Fees, and Inspectors Senator Young 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0510 (HB0274/CH0234) Frederick County - Gaming Events Senator Hough 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0564 /CH0365 (HB0938) Prince George's County - Maryland-Washington Regional District - Fairness in Zoning Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0623 Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners Senator Currie 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0831 (HB1180) Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Baltimore County Senators 4 2 In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0939 Prince George's County - Maintenance of Effort - Property Tax Rate Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM