Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

County Executives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0009 /CH0245 (SB0064)
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 /CH0261
Title
Office of Legislative Audits - Local School System Audits
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0415 (SB0419)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park Amphitheater
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0764 (SB0521)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816 /CH0632
Title
Cecil County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065
Title
Montgomery County Board of Education - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy MC 2-16
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1124
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures PG/MC 118-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1135 /CH0299
Title
Prince George's County - Board of License Commissioners - Budget and Funding PG 308-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1521 (SB1140/CH0242)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Youth and Civic Center License
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1556 (SB1128/CH0712)
Title
Frederick County Sheriff - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 (HB0009/CH0245)
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Baltimore County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0104 /CH0018
Title
Housing and Community Development - Local Government Infrastructure Projects - Financing
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0419 (HB0415)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park Amphitheater
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0521 (HB0764)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1128 /CH0712 (HB1556)
Title
Frederick County Sheriff - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1140 /CH0242 (HB1521)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Youth and Civic Center License
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0009 /CH0245 (SB0064) Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0352 /CH0261 Office of Legislative Audits - Local School System Audits Delegate Ghrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Appropriations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0415 (SB0419) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park Amphitheater Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0764 (SB0521) Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0816 /CH0632 Cecil County - Sheriff - Salary Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 632
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1065 Montgomery County Board of Education - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy MC 2-16 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1124 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures PG/MC 118-16 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1135 /CH0299 Prince George's County - Board of License Commissioners - Budget and Funding PG 308-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1521 (SB1140/CH0242) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Youth and Civic Center License Delegate Anderton 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1556 (SB1128/CH0712) Frederick County Sheriff - Collective Bargaining Delegate Folden 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
4/09/2016 - 9:30 AM
Rules
SB0064 (HB0009/CH0245) Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Baltimore County Senators 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0104 /CH0018 Housing and Community Development - Local Government Infrastructure Projects - Financing Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0419 (HB0415) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Downs Park Amphitheater Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 12:00 PM
SB0521 (HB0764) Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1128 /CH0712 (HB1556) Frederick County Sheriff - Collective Bargaining Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 712
Finance
3/18/2016 - 12:30 PM
Appropriations
4/09/2016 - 9:30 AM
SB1140 /CH0242 (HB1521) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Youth and Civic Center License Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM