Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

County Executives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0088 /CH0850
Title
Education - Selection of Members to the Baltimore County School Board
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0215
Title
County Revenues - Business Fees and Personal Property Tax Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0315 /CH0442
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Contracts to Sell Liquor for Off-Premises Consumption MC 18-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 (SB0889)
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures MC/PG 105-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0882 (SB0805)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission Members
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0976 (SB0550)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County Council
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1317 /CH0812
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Regulation Reform Act of 2017 PG 310-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1341
Title
Maryland Public School Transparency and Accountability Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1431
Title
Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1551 /CH0456
Title
Prince George's County Local Management Board - Strategic Plan, Report, and Study PG 426-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1641
Title
Corporations and Associations - Nonprofit Corporations - Legislative Advocacy
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0164
Title
Baltimore County - Ethics - Prohibitions and Requirements Regarding Payments During Pendency of Zoning Applications
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0488 /CH0811
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Regulation Reform Act of 2017
Sponsor
Prince George's County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0497 /CH0446 (HB0093)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Operation License Renewal Term and Local Development Council Membership
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 (HB0976)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County Council
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 (HB0882)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission Members
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0889 (HB0326)
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0088 /CH0850 Education - Selection of Members to the Baltimore County School Board Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 850
Ways and Means
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0215 County Revenues - Business Fees and Personal Property Tax Exemption Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
HB0315 /CH0442 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Contracts to Sell Liquor for Off-Premises Consumption MC 18-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0326 (SB0889) Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures MC/PG 105-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0882 (SB0805) Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission Members Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0976 (SB0550) Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County Council Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1317 /CH0812 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Regulation Reform Act of 2017 PG 310-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 812
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1341 Maryland Public School Transparency and Accountability Act Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1431 Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (36-0)
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1551 /CH0456 Prince George's County Local Management Board - Strategic Plan, Report, and Study PG 426-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1641 Corporations and Associations - Nonprofit Corporations - Legislative Advocacy Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0164 Baltimore County - Ethics - Prohibitions and Requirements Regarding Payments During Pendency of Zoning Applications Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0488 /CH0811 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Regulation Reform Act of 2017 Prince George's County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 811
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0497 /CH0446 (HB0093) Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Operation License Renewal Term and Local Development Council Membership Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0550 (HB0976) Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County Council Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0805 (HB0882) Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission Members Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0889 (HB0326) Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM