Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

County Executives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540 (SB0511/CH0172)
Title
Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993 /CH0554 (SB0710/CH0555)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409 /CH0744
Title
Howard County - School Facilities Surcharge - Rates Ho. Co. 03-19
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511 /CH0172 (HB0540)
Title
Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0710 /CH0555 (HB0993/CH0554)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 (HB1131)
Title
Baltimore County - Maryland Stadium Authority - Public School Construction
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0540 (SB0511/CH0172) Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0993 /CH0554 (SB0710/CH0555) Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1409 /CH0744 Howard County - School Facilities Surcharge - Rates Ho. Co. 03-19 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 744
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0511 /CH0172 (HB0540) Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Finance
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0710 /CH0555 (HB0993/CH0554) Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0758 (HB1131) Baltimore County - Maryland Stadium Authority - Public School Construction Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:21 PM