Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Court of Appeals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054 /CH0488 (SB0064)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0073 /CH0396 (SB0192)
Title
Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0611)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0427
Title
Voters' Legislative Districting Panel - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0428
Title
Voters' Congressional Districting Panel - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0542 /CH0479 (SB0264/CH0478)
Title
Circuit Court for Calvert County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0659
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0850 (SB0448)
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards and Process
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0906
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1059 (SB0686)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1135
Title
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 (HB0054/CH0488)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0130
Title
Criminal Procedure - Shielding - Misdemeanor Convictions
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264 /CH0478 (HB0542/CH0479)
Title
Circuit Court for Calvert County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0317
Title
Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit Card
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0448 (HB0850)
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards and Process
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0611 (HB0162)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0686 (HB1059)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849
Title
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Jury Sentencing Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0054 /CH0488 (SB0064) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 488
Judiciary
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0073 /CH0396 (SB0192) Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2015 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0162 (SB0611) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0427 Voters' Legislative Districting Panel - Establishment Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0428 Voters' Congressional Districting Panel - Establishment Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0457 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0542 /CH0479 (SB0264/CH0478) Circuit Court for Calvert County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 479
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0659 Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0850 (SB0448) Congressional Districts - Standards and Process Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0906 Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1059 (SB0686) Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1135 Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0064 (HB0054/CH0488) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0130 Criminal Procedure - Shielding - Misdemeanor Convictions Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0264 /CH0478 (HB0542/CH0479) Circuit Court for Calvert County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel Senator Miller 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 478
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0317 Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit Card Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0448 (HB0850) Congressional Districts - Standards and Process Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0611 (HB0162) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0686 (HB1059) Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0849 Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Jury Sentencing Repeal Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Raskin)
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM