Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Court of Appeals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 (SB0307)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0537
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0949
Title
Attorney Grievance Commission - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1071
Title
Courts - Business and Technology Court
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1081 (SB1050)
Title
Civil Actions – Body Attachment – Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246 (SB0954)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1411 (SB0346)
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Reinstatement
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1585 (SB0511)
Title
Civil Actions - Active Duty Service Members - Electronic Deposition and Testimony
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1619
Title
Civil Actions - Nonattorney Representation - Corporations, Partnerships, LLCs, and Sole Proprietorships
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307 (HB0356)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346 (HB1411)
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Reinstatement
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511 (HB1585)
Title
Civil Actions – Active Duty Service Members – Electronic Deposition and Testimony
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0954 (HB1246)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1050 (HB1081)
Title
Civil Actions - Body Attachment - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1068 /CH0732 (HB1634/CH0731)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1263
Title
Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation)
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0356 (SB0307) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0537 Potomac Compact for Fair Representation Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0887 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0949 Attorney Grievance Commission - Membership Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1071 Courts - Business and Technology Court Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1081 (SB1050) Civil Actions – Body Attachment – Procedures Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1246 (SB0954) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1411 (SB0346) Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Reinstatement Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1585 (SB0511) Civil Actions - Active Duty Service Members - Electronic Deposition and Testimony Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1619 Civil Actions - Nonattorney Representation - Corporations, Partnerships, LLCs, and Sole Proprietorships Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0307 (HB0356) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0346 (HB1411) Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Reinstatement Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0511 (HB1585) Civil Actions – Active Duty Service Members – Electronic Deposition and Testimony Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0816 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0954 (HB1246) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1050 (HB1081) Civil Actions - Body Attachment - Procedures Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1068 /CH0732 (HB1634/CH0731) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1263 Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation) Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM