Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Court Costs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340 (SB0405)
Title
Criminal Law - Extortion - Unauthorized Software
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0531
Title
Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0772 (SB0287)
Title
Civil Action - Unauthorized Access to Computers and Data
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0849 (SB0615)
Title
Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of Action
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1143
Title
Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1247
Title
Family Law - Child Support Actions - Court Costs
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0287 (HB0772)
Title
Civil Action - Unauthorized Access to Computers and Data
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0405 (HB0340)
Title
Criminal Law - Extortion - Unauthorized Software
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0490
Title
Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work Act
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0615 (HB0849)
Title
Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of Action
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0699 (HB0467/CH0782)
Title
Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0726
Title
Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Awards of Certain Fees and Costs and Prohibition Against Retaliation
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0340 (SB0405) Criminal Law - Extortion - Unauthorized Software Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0531 Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0772 (SB0287) Civil Action - Unauthorized Access to Computers and Data Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0849 (SB0615) Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of Action Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1143 Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2017 Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1247 Family Law - Child Support Actions - Court Costs Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0287 (HB0772) Civil Action - Unauthorized Access to Computers and Data Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0405 (HB0340) Criminal Law - Extortion - Unauthorized Software Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0490 Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work Act Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0615 (HB0849) Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of Action Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0699 (HB0467/CH0782) Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
SB0726 Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Awards of Certain Fees and Costs and Prohibition Against Retaliation Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM