Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Court of Special Appeals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0605 /CH0443 (SB0859/CH0442)
Title
Frederick County - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Administrative Appeals
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0659 /CH0541 (SB0187/CH0540)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim's Right to Restitution - Appeal
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0980
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Disciplinary Action Report - Publication on Web Site
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1202 (SB0971)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Appeal Right
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0187 /CH0540 (HB0659/CH0541)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim's Right to Restitution - Appeal
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0859 /CH0442 (HB0605/CH0443)
Title
Frederick County - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Administrative Appeals
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0971 (HB1202)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Appeal Right
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0605 /CH0443 (SB0859/CH0442) Frederick County - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Administrative Appeals Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0659 /CH0541 (SB0187/CH0540) Criminal Procedure - Victim's Right to Restitution - Appeal Delegate Proctor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0980 State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Disciplinary Action Report - Publication on Web Site Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1202 (SB0971) Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Appeal Right Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0187 /CH0540 (HB0659/CH0541) Criminal Procedure - Victim's Right to Restitution - Appeal Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0859 /CH0442 (HB0605/CH0443) Frederick County - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Administrative Appeals Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0971 (HB1202) Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Appeal Right Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM