Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Court of Special Appeals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487
Title
Judicial Elections - Retention and Frequency
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1329 (SB0595)
Title
Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0246
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Election
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0595 (HB1329)
Title
Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1004 /CH0770
Title
Election Law - Election Calendar and Processes - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0487 Judicial Elections - Retention and Frequency Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1329 (SB0595) Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0246 Circuit Court Judges - Election Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0595 (HB1329) Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB1004 /CH0770 Election Law - Election Calendar and Processes - Revisions Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 770
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:21 PM