Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Crabs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0029
Title
Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0524 /CH0054 (SB0128/CH0053)
Title
Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1314 /CH0400
Title
Crabs - Harvest Times - Holidays
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 /CH0401
Title
Crabs - Harvest Times - Holidays
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0128 /CH0053 (HB0524/CH0054)
Title
Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0029 Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0524 /CH0054 (SB0128/CH0053) Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - Repeal Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1314 /CH0400 Crabs - Harvest Times - Holidays Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0059 /CH0401 Crabs - Harvest Times - Holidays Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0128 /CH0053 (HB0524/CH0054) Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - Repeal Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Finance
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM