Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Criminal Injuries Compensation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187 /CH0586
Title
Prince George’s County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 305–19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0968 /CH0378 (SB0672)
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Compensation to Claimants
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1152
Title
Interstate Human Trafficking of Minors Prohibition Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1248 (SB0933)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy and Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1249 (SB0657/CH0431)
Title
Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0145
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Claims - Electronic Filing
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0657 /CH0431 (HB1249)
Title
Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 (HB0968/CH0378)
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Compensation to Claimants
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933 (HB1248)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy and Reimbursement
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0965
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0187 /CH0586 Prince George’s County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 305–19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0968 /CH0378 (SB0672) Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Compensation to Claimants Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378
Judiciary
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1152 Interstate Human Trafficking of Minors Prohibition Act Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1248 (SB0933) Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy and Reimbursement Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1249 (SB0657/CH0431) Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis Delegate Reznik 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
SB0061 /CH0145 Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Claims - Electronic Filing Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0657 /CH0431 (HB1249) Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 9:00 AM
Finance
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0672 (HB0968/CH0378) Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Compensation to Claimants Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0933 (HB1248) Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy and Reimbursement Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2019 - 9:30 AM
SB0965 Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Funding Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:21 PM