Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cybersecurity -see also- Safety

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0165 /CH0553 (SB0137/CH0554)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212 /CH0827 (SB0270/CH0828)
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347
Title
Cybersecurity Investment Fund and Enterprise Fund - Higher Education Loan Repayment - Expanded Use
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0378 (SB0318)
Title
Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit - Eligibility and Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0435
Title
Governmental Procedures - Security of Computerized Data - Encryption of Personal Information
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0772 (SB0287)
Title
Civil Action - Unauthorized Access to Computers and Data
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0965 (SB0552)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974 /CH0518 (SB0525)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1454
Title
Task Force on Electric Power Grid Security
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 /CH0554 (HB0165/CH0553)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 /CH0828 (HB0212/CH0827)
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0286
Title
Statewide Information Technology Master Plan - Inclusion of Cybersecurity Framework - Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0287 (HB0772)
Title
Civil Action - Unauthorized Access to Computers and Data
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0318 (HB0378)
Title
Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit - Eligibility and Sunset Extension
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525 (HB0974/CH0518)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 (HB0965)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0165 /CH0553 (SB0137/CH0554) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2017 - 3:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0212 /CH0827 (SB0270/CH0828) Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827
Economic Matters
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0347 Cybersecurity Investment Fund and Enterprise Fund - Higher Education Loan Repayment - Expanded Use Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
Appropriations
HB0378 (SB0318) Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit - Eligibility and Sunset Extension Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0435 Governmental Procedures - Security of Computerized Data - Encryption of Personal Information Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0772 (SB0287) Civil Action - Unauthorized Access to Computers and Data Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0965 (SB0552) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0974 /CH0518 (SB0525) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Economic Matters
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1454 Task Force on Electric Power Grid Security Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0137 /CH0554 (HB0165/CH0553) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0270 /CH0828 (HB0212/CH0827) Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828
Finance
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0286 Statewide Information Technology Master Plan - Inclusion of Cybersecurity Framework - Requirement Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0287 (HB0772) Civil Action - Unauthorized Access to Computers and Data Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0318 (HB0378) Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit - Eligibility and Sunset Extension President 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0525 (HB0974/CH0518) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0552 (HB0965) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM