Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0015
Title
Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Organization and Negotiation
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0083 (SB0073/CH0647)
Title
Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0256
Title
Prince George's County - Landlord-Tenant Cases - Alternative Dispute Resolution Program PG 409-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284 /CH0607 (SB0636)
Title
Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0498 /CH0112
Title
Calvert County - Salary of Assistant Sheriff
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 /CH0820 (SB0436/CH0821)
Title
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0631 /CH0540
Title
Somerset County - Fines and Forfeitures - Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720 /CH0167 (SB0486/CH0168)
Title
Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0809 /CH0829
Title
Howard County - Sheriff's Salary Ho. Co. 8-18
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169 (SB0343)
Title
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1247 /CH0838
Title
Anne Arundel County – Orphans’ Court Judges – Compensation
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1357 /CH0841
Title
Calvert County - County Officials - Salaries
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 /CH0647 (HB0083)
Title
Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0343 (HB1169)
Title
Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 /CH0821 (HB0554/CH0820)
Title
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries
Sponsor
Caroline County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 /CH0168 (HB0720/CH0167)
Title
Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0636 (HB0284/CH0607)
Title
Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0825
Title
Baltimore City - Sheriff's Office - Appointments, Salaries, and Workers' Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1259 /CH0370
Title
Harford County District Courthouse – H. Wayne Norman, Jr. Memorial Plaza
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0015 Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Organization and Negotiation Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0083 (SB0073/CH0647) Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0256 Prince George's County - Landlord-Tenant Cases - Alternative Dispute Resolution Program PG 409-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0284 /CH0607 (SB0636) Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective Bargaining Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0498 /CH0112 Calvert County - Salary of Assistant Sheriff Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0554 /CH0820 (SB0436/CH0821) Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries Caroline County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0631 /CH0540 Somerset County - Fines and Forfeitures - Distribution Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0720 /CH0167 (SB0486/CH0168) Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0809 /CH0829 Howard County - Sheriff's Salary Ho. Co. 8-18 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 829
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1169 (SB0343) Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1247 /CH0838 Anne Arundel County – Orphans’ Court Judges – Compensation Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1357 /CH0841 Calvert County - County Officials - Salaries Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 841
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0073 /CH0647 (HB0083) Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining Harford County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Finance
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0343 (HB1169) Baltimore City - Office of State's Attorney - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0436 /CH0821 (HB0554/CH0820) Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries Caroline County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0486 /CH0168 (HB0720/CH0167) Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0636 (HB0284/CH0607) Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective Bargaining Cecil County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0825 Baltimore City - Sheriff's Office - Appointments, Salaries, and Workers' Compensation Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB1259 /CH0370 Harford County District Courthouse – H. Wayne Norman, Jr. Memorial Plaza Senator Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM