Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Human Relations (D5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0759
Title
Home Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269 (SB0223)
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1478
Title
Employment Discrimination - Sexual Harassment - Definition of Employer
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0024
Title
Discrimination in Housing - Military Status
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0223 (HB1269)
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869
Title
Governor's Office of Minority Affairs - Workgroup on Reconciliation and Equity
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0948
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0106 Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0759 Home Act of 2016 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1269 (SB0223) Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1478 Employment Discrimination - Sexual Harassment - Definition of Employer Delegate Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0024 Discrimination in Housing - Military Status Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0223 (HB1269) Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0869 Governor's Office of Minority Affairs - Workgroup on Reconciliation and Equity Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0948 Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM