Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Human Relations (D5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0240 /CH0028 (SB0232/CH0029)
Title
Hate Crimes – Threats
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 (SB0848)
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0307 /CH0041
Title
Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0317 (SB0271)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0451 (SB0812)
Title
Fair Housing Opportunities Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0661
Title
Employment Discrimination - Definition of Employer
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0679 /CH0222 (SB0872)
Title
Workplace Harassment – Prohibitions, Liability, Enforcement, and Prevention Training
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1107 (SB0518)
Title
Discrimination in Employment - Pregnancy and Childbirth
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1239
Title
Discrimination in Employment for Use of Medical Cannabis - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1244 (SB0330/CH0523)
Title
Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1262
Title
Human Relations – Employment Discrimination and Discriminatory Housing Practices – Time to File Complaint
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0232 /CH0029 (HB0240/CH0028)
Title
Hate Crimes – Threats
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0271 (HB0317)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0330 /CH0523 (HB1244)
Title
Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0518 (HB1107)
Title
Discrimination in Employment - Pregnancy and Childbirth
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0534
Title
Public Buildings and Places of Public Accommodation - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812 (HB0451)
Title
Fair Housing Opportunities Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0848 (HB0295)
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872 (HB0679/CH0222)
Title
Workplace Harassment - Prohibitions, Liability, and Enforcement
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1032 /CH0453
Title
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0240 /CH0028 (SB0232/CH0029) Hate Crimes – Threats Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 28
Judiciary
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0295 (SB0848) Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Ways and Means
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0307 /CH0041 Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Judiciary
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0317 (SB0271) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0451 (SB0812) Fair Housing Opportunities Act of 2019 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0661 Employment Discrimination - Definition of Employer Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0679 /CH0222 (SB0872) Workplace Harassment – Prohibitions, Liability, Enforcement, and Prevention Training Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
HB1107 (SB0518) Discrimination in Employment - Pregnancy and Childbirth Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/11/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1239 Discrimination in Employment for Use of Medical Cannabis - Prohibition Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1244 (SB0330/CH0523) Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Judicial Proceedings
HB1262 Human Relations – Employment Discrimination and Discriminatory Housing Practices – Time to File Complaint Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0232 /CH0029 (HB0240/CH0028) Hate Crimes – Threats Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 29
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0271 (HB0317) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0330 /CH0523 (HB1244) Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0518 (HB1107) Discrimination in Employment - Pregnancy and Childbirth Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0534 Public Buildings and Places of Public Accommodation - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0812 (HB0451) Fair Housing Opportunities Act of 2019 Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0848 (HB0295) Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0872 (HB0679/CH0222) Workplace Harassment - Prohibitions, Liability, and Enforcement President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1032 /CH0453 Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity - Extension Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM