Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Deaf Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0137 /CH0538 (SB0035)
Title
State Personnel - Professional Service - Maryland School for the Deaf - Teachers
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0145 /CH0285 (SB0301/CH0286)
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064
Title
Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1192 /CH0336 (SB1014/CH0337)
Title
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1384 /CH0741 (SB0677/CH0742)
Title
Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0035 (HB0137/CH0538)
Title
State Personnel - Professional Service - Maryland School for the Deaf - Teachers
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 /CH0392
Title
Maryland School for the Deaf - Employees - Annual and Personal Leave
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0301 /CH0286 (HB0145/CH0285)
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 /CH0742 (HB1384/CH0741)
Title
Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0678 /CH0407
Title
State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0785
Title
Education - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Infants or Toddlers
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1014 /CH0337 (HB1192/CH0336)
Title
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0137 /CH0538 (SB0035) State Personnel - Professional Service - Maryland School for the Deaf - Teachers Delegate Kerr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 538
Appropriations
1/29/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0145 /CH0285 (SB0301/CH0286) Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights Delegate Young, K. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2019 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB1064 Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1192 /CH0336 (SB1014/CH0337) Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Appropriations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1384 /CH0741 (SB0677/CH0742) Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 741
Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0035 (HB0137/CH0538) State Personnel - Professional Service - Maryland School for the Deaf - Teachers Senator Young 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0064 /CH0392 Maryland School for the Deaf - Employees - Annual and Personal Leave Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Finance
1/24/2019 - 2:30 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0301 /CH0286 (HB0145/CH0285) Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Finance
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0677 /CH0742 (HB1384/CH0741) Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 742
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Health and Government Operations
SB0678 /CH0407 State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0785 Education - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Infants or Toddlers Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1014 /CH0337 (HB1192/CH0336) Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement Senator Patterson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:22 PM