Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dealers -see also- Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0042
Title
Public Safety - Firearms - Application Approval Before Sale, Rental, or Transfer
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060
Title
Repeal of the Firearm Safety Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0337 /CH0394
Title
Farm Breweries - Location and Self-Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 /CH0596
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Breweries - Festival Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0713
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Safety Devices - External Safety Locks
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0715 (SB0584)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0719
Title
Public Safety - Firearms - Probation Before Judgment
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0818
Title
Regulated Firearms - Licensed Dealer or Secondary Seller - National Instant Criminal Background (NICS) Check
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0830 (SB0287)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Shipment of Kosher Wine Sold at Retail
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0880 (SB0658)
Title
Marijuana Control Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995
Title
Firearms Freedom Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dwyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196 (SB0065)
Title
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras Required
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1368 (SB1083)
Title
State Boat Act - Dealer's License - Lienholder Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1538
Title
Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers - Locations for Transaction of Business
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0065 (HB1196)
Title
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras Required
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0287 (HB0830)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Shipment of Kosher Wine Sold at Retail
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0584 (HB0715)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658 (HB0880)
Title
The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0728
Title
Public Safety - Licensed Firearms Dealers - Background Checks
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0788
Title
Income Tax Credit - Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment - Retail Service Station Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1083 (HB1368)
Title
State Boat Act - Dealer's License - Lienholder Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1110
Title
Business Regulation - Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Copper Wire
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0042 Public Safety - Firearms - Application Approval Before Sale, Rental, or Transfer Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0060 Repeal of the Firearm Safety Act of 2013 Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0337 /CH0394 Farm Breweries - Location and Self-Distribution Delegate Schulz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0356 /CH0596 Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Breweries - Festival Licenses Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0713 Public Safety - Handgun Safety Devices - External Safety Locks Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0715 (SB0584) Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - Repeal Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0719 Public Safety - Firearms - Probation Before Judgment Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0818 Regulated Firearms - Licensed Dealer or Secondary Seller - National Instant Criminal Background (NICS) Check Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0830 (SB0287) Alcoholic Beverages - Shipment of Kosher Wine Sold at Retail Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0880 (SB0658) Marijuana Control Act of 2014 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0995 Firearms Freedom Act Delegate Dwyer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1196 (SB0065) Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras Required Delegate Swain 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1368 (SB1083) State Boat Act - Dealer's License - Lienholder Exemption Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1538 Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers - Locations for Transaction of Business Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0065 (HB1196) Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras Required Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
SB0287 (HB0830) Alcoholic Beverages - Shipment of Kosher Wine Sold at Retail Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0584 (HB0715) Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - Repeal Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0658 (HB0880) The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0728 Public Safety - Licensed Firearms Dealers - Background Checks Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0788 Income Tax Credit - Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment - Retail Service Station Dealers Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1083 (HB1368) State Boat Act - Dealer's License - Lienholder Exemption Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1110 Business Regulation - Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Copper Wire Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM