Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dealers -see also- Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0047 /CH0199 (SB0090/CH0200)
Title
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0148 /CH0120
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Per Diem Licenses MC 8-18
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0213 (SB0253/CH0224)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0358 (SB0313)
Title
Crimes - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Volume Dealers
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0434 (SB0529)
Title
Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0466
Title
Baltimore City - Ammunition Sales - Record Keeping
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0649
Title
Criminal Law - Opioids - Distribution Causing Death of Minor
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0724 (SB0604)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsor
Western Maryland Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1418
Title
Criminal Law - Distribution of Fentanyl - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1480 /CH0592 (SB0982/CH0593)
Title
Controlled Dangerous Substances - Distributors - Reporting Suspicious Orders
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1646 /CH0251 (SB1036)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1730
Title
Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 /CH0200 (HB0047/CH0199)
Title
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0253 /CH0224 (HB0213)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0313 (HB0358)
Title
Crimes - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Volume Dealers
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0529 (HB0434)
Title
Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0604 (HB0724)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908
Title
Partial Repeal of Firearms Safety Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0982 /CH0593 (HB1480/CH0592)
Title
Controlled Dangerous Substances - Distributors - Reporting Suspicious Orders
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1036 (HB1646/CH0251)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0047 /CH0199 (SB0090/CH0200) Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Economic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0148 /CH0120 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Per Diem Licenses MC 8-18 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0213 (SB0253/CH0224) Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition Delegate Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0358 (SB0313) Crimes - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Volume Dealers Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0434 (SB0529) Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty Requirements Delegate Davis 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments
Economic Matters
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0466 Baltimore City - Ammunition Sales - Record Keeping Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0649 Criminal Law - Opioids - Distribution Causing Death of Minor Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0724 (SB0604) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer Western Maryland Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1418 Criminal Law - Distribution of Fentanyl - Penalties Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1480 /CH0592 (SB0982/CH0593) Controlled Dangerous Substances - Distributors - Reporting Suspicious Orders Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1646 /CH0251 (SB1036) Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1730 Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in Death Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0090 /CH0200 (HB0047/CH0199) Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Finance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0253 /CH0224 (HB0213) Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0313 (HB0358) Crimes - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Volume Dealers President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0529 (HB0434) Vehicle Manufacturers - Notice to Purchasers and Lessees - Warranty Requirements Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0604 (HB0724) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0908 Partial Repeal of Firearms Safety Act of 2013 Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0982 /CH0593 (HB1480/CH0592) Controlled Dangerous Substances - Distributors - Reporting Suspicious Orders President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 593
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1036 (HB1646/CH0251) Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM