Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dealers -see also- Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0096
Title
Public Safety – Regulated Firearms – Prohibition of Loans
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0637 /CH0676 (SB0584/CH0677)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0786 (SB0737)
Title
Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Secondary Transactions
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0812
Title
Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0877
Title
Crimes - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Sentences
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0934 (SB0891/CH0307)
Title
Consumer Protection - Resale of Tickets - Disclosures and Refunds
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1146 (SB0664)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0008
Title
Criminal Law - Computer-Aided Firearm Fabrication - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346 /CH0458
Title
Public Safety – Regulated Firearms – Prohibition of Loans
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0622 /CH0335 (HB0774)
Title
Governor’s Office of Crime Control and Prevention – Crime Firearms – Study
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 (HB1146)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737 (HB0786)
Title
Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, Transfers, and Loans
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891 /CH0307 (HB0934)
Title
Consumer Protection - Resale of Tickets - Disclosures and Refunds
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0096 Public Safety – Regulated Firearms – Prohibition of Loans Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
Rules
HB0637 /CH0676 (SB0584/CH0677) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 676
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0786 (SB0737) Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Secondary Transactions Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0812 Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Penalty Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0877 Crimes - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Sentences Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0934 (SB0891/CH0307) Consumer Protection - Resale of Tickets - Disclosures and Refunds Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1146 (SB0664) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
SB0008 Criminal Law - Computer-Aided Firearm Fabrication - Prohibitions Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0346 /CH0458 Public Safety – Regulated Firearms – Prohibition of Loans Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0622 /CH0335 (HB0774) Governor’s Office of Crime Control and Prevention – Crime Firearms – Study Senator Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0664 (HB1146) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0737 (HB0786) Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, Transfers, and Loans Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0891 /CH0307 (HB0934) Consumer Protection - Resale of Tickets - Disclosures and Refunds Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:22 PM