Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Debt Collection -see also- Attachments and Garnishments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187 /CH0479 (SB0006)
Title
Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – Expansion
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254
Title
Real Property - Ground Leases - Unlawful Collections
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 /CH0108
Title
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0673 (SB0022)
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161 /CH0195 (SB0856/CH0196)
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1253 (SB0068)
Title
Business Regulation - Collection Agencies - Exemptions From Licensure
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1465 /CH0058
Title
Tax Sales - Homeowner Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1539 /CH0846 (SB0853/CH0017)
Title
Labor and Employment – General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1560
Title
Baltimore City Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Bill Dispute Process, Billing Program Review, and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1642 (SB1012)
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Student Education Loans – Ombudsman
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 (HB0187/CH0479)
Title
Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - Expansion
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022 (HB0673)
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0042 /CH0549
Title
Courts - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068 (HB1253)
Title
Business Regulation - Collection Agencies - Exemptions From Licensure
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 /CH0017 (HB1539/CH0846)
Title
Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0856 /CH0196 (HB1161/CH0195)
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1012 (HB1642)
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Student Education Loans - Ombudsman and Licensing of Servicers
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1068 /CH0732 (HB1634/CH0731)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0187 /CH0479 (SB0006) Financial Institutions – Nondepository Special Fund – Expansion Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Economic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0254 Real Property - Ground Leases - Unlawful Collections Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0275 /CH0108 St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0673 (SB0022) Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1161 /CH0195 (SB0856/CH0196) Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists Delegate Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Economic Matters
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1253 (SB0068) Business Regulation - Collection Agencies - Exemptions From Licensure Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2018 - 2:30 PM
HB1465 /CH0058 Tax Sales - Homeowner Protections Delegate Walker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1539 /CH0846 (SB0853/CH0017) Labor and Employment – General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages Delegate Lisanti 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 846
Economic Matters
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1560 Baltimore City Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Bill Dispute Process, Billing Program Review, and Report Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1642 (SB1012) Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Student Education Loans – Ombudsman Delegate Frick 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0006 (HB0187/CH0479) Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - Expansion Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0022 (HB0673) Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0042 /CH0549 Courts - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Statute of Limitations Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0068 (HB1253) Business Regulation - Collection Agencies - Exemptions From Licensure Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0853 /CH0017 (HB1539/CH0846) Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
Finance
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0856 /CH0196 (HB1161/CH0195) Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1012 (HB1642) Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Student Education Loans - Ombudsman and Licensing of Servicers Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1068 /CH0732 (HB1634/CH0731) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM