Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Debt Management

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0262
Title
Student Debt Disclosure Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0441 /CH0594 (SB0460)
Title
Education - Debt Service for Transferred Schools - County Reimbursement Grace Period
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0568
Title
Financial Institutions - Credit Unions - Liens and Rights to a Setoff
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1033
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Discharged Student Loan Debt
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1055 (SB0737/CH0424)
Title
St. Mary's County - Bonds and Other Evidences of Indebtedness - Limitations and Repayment
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155 (SB0367/CH0231)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1517 (SB0465/CH0629)
Title
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge Loans
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1576 /CH0311
Title
Prince George's County - Student Loan Refinancing Authority PG 419-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0367 /CH0231 (HB1155)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 (HB0441/CH0594)
Title
Education - Debt Service for Transferred Schools - County Reimbursement Grace Period
Sponsor
Senator Conway
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0465 /CH0629 (HB1517)
Title
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge Loans
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737 /CH0424 (HB1055)
Title
St. Mary's County - Bonds and Other Evidences of Indebtedness - Limitations and Repayment
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0262 Student Debt Disclosure Act of 2017 Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0441 /CH0594 (SB0460) Education - Debt Service for Transferred Schools - County Reimbursement Grace Period Delegate Anderson 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0568 Financial Institutions - Credit Unions - Liens and Rights to a Setoff Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1033 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Discharged Student Loan Debt Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1055 (SB0737/CH0424) St. Mary's County - Bonds and Other Evidences of Indebtedness - Limitations and Repayment St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1155 (SB0367/CH0231) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1517 (SB0465/CH0629) Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge Loans Delegate Glenn 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Economic Matters
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1576 /CH0311 Prince George's County - Student Loan Refinancing Authority PG 419-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0367 /CH0231 (HB1155) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0460 (HB0441/CH0594) Education - Debt Service for Transferred Schools - County Reimbursement Grace Period Senator Conway 4 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0465 /CH0629 (HB1517) Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge Loans Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0737 /CH0424 (HB1055) St. Mary's County - Bonds and Other Evidences of Indebtedness - Limitations and Repayment Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM