Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Delivery Services

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0714 /CH0306 (SB0525/CH0307)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1055 (SB0974)
Title
Public Ethics – Lobbyists – Gift Exception and Regulated Activities Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1483 (SB0874)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525 /CH0307 (HB0714/CH0306)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0874 (HB1483)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0714 /CH0306 (SB0525/CH0307) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 306
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1055 (SB0974) Public Ethics – Lobbyists – Gift Exception and Regulated Activities Exemption Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1483 (SB0874) Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0525 /CH0307 (HB0714/CH0306) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 307
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0874 (HB1483) Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:15 PM