Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dental Hygienists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0070 (SB1256)
Title
Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for Violations
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0438
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652
Title
Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0879 (SB0544)
Title
Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284 /CH0621
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults – Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0544 (HB0879)
Title
Health Occupations - Advanced Practice Dental Hygiene
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1256 (HB0070)
Title
Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for Violations
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0070 (SB1256) Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for Violations Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0438 State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0652 Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders Delegate West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0879 (SB0544) Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0284 /CH0621 Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults – Pilot Program Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Finance
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0544 (HB0879) Health Occupations - Advanced Practice Dental Hygiene Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1256 (HB0070) Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for Violations Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM