Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dentists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0506
Title
Environment - Dental Mercury - Water or Sewerage Service Bill Insert
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0625 (SB0614)
Title
Environment - Dental Radiation Machines - Maintenance and Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0783
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Jurisdiction over Dentists Who Prepare and Dispense Dental Products and Antibiotics
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1032 (SB0166)
Title
Dentists, Physicians, and Podiatrists - Dispensing Prescription Drugs - Inspection by Division of Drug Control
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1115 /CH0404 (SB0593)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Mandatory Coverage - Medical and Hospital Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Donoghue
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1121 /CH0272 (SB0459/CH0271)
Title
Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Provision of Services at a Community-Based Health Fair
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1237 (SB0139/CH0184)
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Prescription Drug or Device Dispensing - Medical Facilities or Clinics That Specialize in Treatment Reimbursable Through Workers' Compensation Insurance
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290 (SB0837)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays
Sponsor
Delegate Frank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1310 (SB0834)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139 /CH0184 (HB1237)
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Prescription Drug or Device Dispensing - Medical Facilities or Clinics That Specialize in Treatment Reimbursable Through Workers' Compensation Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166 (HB1032)
Title
Dentists, Physicians, and Podiatrists - Dispensing Prescription Drugs - Inspection by Division of Drug Control
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0459 /CH0271 (HB1121/CH0272)
Title
Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Provision of Services at a Community-Based Health Fair
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0515
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Jurisdiction over Dentists Who Prepare and Dispense Dental Products and Antibiotics
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0593 (HB1115/CH0404)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0614 (HB0625)
Title
Environment - Dental Radiation Machines - Maintenance and Inspections
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837 (HB1290)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0506 Environment - Dental Mercury - Water or Sewerage Service Bill Insert Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0625 (SB0614) Environment - Dental Radiation Machines - Maintenance and Inspections Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0783 State Board of Pharmacy - Jurisdiction over Dentists Who Prepare and Dispense Dental Products and Antibiotics Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1032 (SB0166) Dentists, Physicians, and Podiatrists - Dispensing Prescription Drugs - Inspection by Division of Drug Control Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1115 /CH0404 (SB0593) Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judicial Proceedings
HB1117 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Mandatory Coverage - Medical and Hospital Benefits Delegate Donoghue 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1121 /CH0272 (SB0459/CH0271) Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Provision of Services at a Community-Based Health Fair Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1237 (SB0139/CH0184) Health Care Practitioners - Prescription Drug or Device Dispensing - Medical Facilities or Clinics That Specialize in Treatment Reimbursable Through Workers' Compensation Insurance Delegate Bromwell 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1290 (SB0837) Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays Delegate Frank 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1310 (SB0834) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0139 /CH0184 (HB1237) Health Care Practitioners - Prescription Drug or Device Dispensing - Medical Facilities or Clinics That Specialize in Treatment Reimbursable Through Workers' Compensation Insurance Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0166 (HB1032) Dentists, Physicians, and Podiatrists - Dispensing Prescription Drugs - Inspection by Division of Drug Control Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0459 /CH0271 (HB1121/CH0272) Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Provision of Services at a Community-Based Health Fair Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0515 State Board of Pharmacy - Jurisdiction over Dentists Who Prepare and Dispense Dental Products and Antibiotics Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0593 (HB1115/CH0404) Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability Senator Montgomery 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0614 (HB0625) Environment - Dental Radiation Machines - Maintenance and Inspections Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0837 (HB1290) Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM