Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dentists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 (SB0431)
Title
Public Health - Dental Services for Adults - Coverage and Access
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0375 /CH0417 (SB0403)
Title
Education - Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547
Title
Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0580 /CH0437 (SB0198)
Title
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0716 /CH0269 (SB0347)
Title
Health Occupations - Prescriber-Pharmacist Agreements and Therapy Management Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766 (SB0421)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Authority - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858 (SB0141)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental Care
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0018
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for Discipline
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 (HB0858)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental Care
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0198 (HB0580/CH0437)
Title
Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0202
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Mental Health and Physical Examinations
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0205
Title
Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Misrepresentation and Practicing Without a License - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347 (HB0716/CH0269)
Title
Health Occupations - Prescriber-Pharmacist Agreements and Therapy Management Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0403 (HB0375/CH0417)
Title
Education - Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0421 (HB0766)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Authority - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0431 (HB0355)
Title
Public Health - Dental Services for Adults - Coverage and Access
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 /CH0363
Title
Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0887
Title
Health Occupations - Dentistry - Scope of Practice and Licensure Exception
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0355 (SB0431) Public Health - Dental Services for Adults - Coverage and Access Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0375 /CH0417 (SB0403) Education - Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0547 Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015 Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0580 /CH0437 (SB0198) Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0716 /CH0269 (SB0347) Health Occupations - Prescriber-Pharmacist Agreements and Therapy Management Contracts Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0766 (SB0421) State Board of Dental Examiners - Authority - Exemptions Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0858 (SB0141) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental Care Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0018 State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for Discipline Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0141 (HB0858) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental Care Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0198 (HB0580/CH0437) Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Recommended Courses Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0202 State Board of Dental Examiners - Mental Health and Physical Examinations Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0205 Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Misrepresentation and Practicing Without a License - Penalties Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0347 (HB0716/CH0269) Health Occupations - Prescriber-Pharmacist Agreements and Therapy Management Contracts Senator Pugh 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0403 (HB0375/CH0417) Education - Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers Senator Madaleno 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0421 (HB0766) State Board of Dental Examiners - Authority - Exemptions Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0431 (HB0355) Public Health - Dental Services for Adults - Coverage and Access Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0556 /CH0363 Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal Law Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0887 Health Occupations - Dentistry - Scope of Practice and Licensure Exception Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM