Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

District of Columbia

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 /CH0678 (SB0485/CH0677)
Title
Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave Insurance
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023 (SB0966)
Title
Task Force to Study Extending Metrorail Service From Shady Grove to the City of Frederick
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1123 /CH0500
Title
Maryland-Washington Metropolitan District - Boundaries - City of Greenbelt PG/MC 117-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1192 /CH0735 (SB0816)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and Fees
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1574 (SB1070)
Title
Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - Preferences
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0272 /CH0181
Title
Financial Aid - Deaf and Hearing Impaired Students - Out-of-State Institutions of Higher Education
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0446
Title
Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0485 /CH0677 (HB0740/CH0678)
Title
Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816 (HB1192/CH0735)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and Fees
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966 (HB1023)
Title
Task Force to Study Extending Metrorail Service From the City of Gaithersburg to the City of Frederick
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1070 (HB1574)
Title
Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - Preferences
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0740 /CH0678 (SB0485/CH0677) Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave Insurance Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 678
Economic Matters
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1023 (SB0966) Task Force to Study Extending Metrorail Service From Shady Grove to the City of Frederick Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1123 /CH0500 Maryland-Washington Metropolitan District - Boundaries - City of Greenbelt PG/MC 117-16 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1192 /CH0735 (SB0816) Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and Fees Delegate McMillan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1574 (SB1070) Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - Preferences Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0272 /CH0181 Financial Aid - Deaf and Hearing Impaired Students - Out-of-State Institutions of Higher Education Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0446 Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0485 /CH0677 (HB0740/CH0678) Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave Insurance Senator Pugh 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
Finance
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0816 (HB1192/CH0735) Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and Fees Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0966 (HB1023) Task Force to Study Extending Metrorail Service From the City of Gaithersburg to the City of Frederick Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1070 (HB1574) Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - Preferences Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM
Click to return on the top page