Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Divorce -see also- Annulment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0293 /CH0490 (SB0274)
Title
Family Law - Divorce - Domestic Violence Order
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0498 /CH0657 (SB0562)
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0722 (SB0881)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749
Title
Annulment and Divorce - Property Disposition - Pets
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0793 /CH0624 (SB0083/CH0625)
Title
Family Law - Divorce - Restoration of Former Name
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0083 /CH0625 (HB0793/CH0624)
Title
Family Law - Divorce - Restoration of Former Name
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0293/CH0490)
Title
Family Law - Divorce - Domestic Violence Order
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0499
Title
Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Court Appearance
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0562 (HB0498/CH0657)
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified Individuals
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 (HB0722)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0293 /CH0490 (SB0274) Family Law - Divorce - Domestic Violence Order Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Judiciary
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0498 /CH0657 (SB0562) Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified Individuals Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0722 (SB0881) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0749 Annulment and Divorce - Property Disposition - Pets Delegate Malone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0793 /CH0624 (SB0083/CH0625) Family Law - Divorce - Restoration of Former Name Delegate Angel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0083 /CH0625 (HB0793/CH0624) Family Law - Divorce - Restoration of Former Name Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0274 (HB0293/CH0490) Family Law - Divorce - Domestic Violence Order Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0499 Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Court Appearance Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0562 (HB0498/CH0657) Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified Individuals Senator Kelley 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Finance
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 (HB0722) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM