Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Divorce -see also- Annulment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 (SB0649)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1034
Title
Grounds for Divorce - Mutual Consent - Military Service Member
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1157
Title
Grounds for Divorce - Mutual Consent - Settlement in Open Court
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1368 /CH0782
Title
Grounds for Divorce - 12-Month Separation - Oral Amendment to Application for Divorce
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1628
Title
Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1710
Title
Income Tax – Addition and Subtraction Modifications – Alimony or Separate Maintenance Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0096 /CH0849
Title
Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Court Appearance
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0120 /CH0850
Title
Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Parties With Minor Children
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0649 (HB0777)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0777 (SB0649) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1034 Grounds for Divorce - Mutual Consent - Military Service Member Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1157 Grounds for Divorce - Mutual Consent - Settlement in Open Court Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1368 /CH0782 Grounds for Divorce - 12-Month Separation - Oral Amendment to Application for Divorce Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 782
Judiciary
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1628 Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1710 Income Tax – Addition and Subtraction Modifications – Alimony or Separate Maintenance Payments Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0096 /CH0849 Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Court Appearance Senator Norman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 849
Judicial Proceedings
1/11/2018 - 1:15 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0120 /CH0850 Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Parties With Minor Children Senator Zirkin 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 850
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0649 (HB0777) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM