Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Dogs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0114
Title
Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Waiver of Adoption Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0311 /CH0161 (SB0101/CH0162)
Title
Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0406 (SB0627)
Title
Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547 /CH0247 (SB0455/CH0248)
Title
Health - Maryland Children's Service Animal Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0981
Title
County Boards of Education - Therapy Dogs - Certification and Use in Schools
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1354
Title
Sales and Use Tax and Personal Property Tax – Services, Aircraft Parts and Equipment, and Data Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090
Title
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101 /CH0162 (HB0311/CH0161)
Title
Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127
Title
Vehicle Laws – Cats and Dogs Left Unattended – Authorized Removal
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0128
Title
Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0412
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0455 /CH0248 (HB0547/CH0247)
Title
Health - Maryland Children's Service Animal Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626
Title
Retail Pet Stores - Transportation of Cats and Dogs by Common Carrier - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0627 (HB0406)
Title
Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0925
Title
Criminal Law - Dangerous and Potentially Dangerous Dogs - Classification and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0114 Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Waiver of Adoption Fee Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0311 /CH0161 (SB0101/CH0162) Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established Delegate Malone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 161
Judiciary
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0406 (SB0627) Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0547 /CH0247 (SB0455/CH0248) Health - Maryland Children's Service Animal Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 247
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0981 County Boards of Education - Therapy Dogs - Certification and Use in Schools Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1354 Sales and Use Tax and Personal Property Tax – Services, Aircraft Parts and Equipment, and Data Centers Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Ways and Means
3/02/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0090 Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0101 /CH0162 (HB0311/CH0161) Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established Senator Simonaire 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 162
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2020 - 2:15 PM
Judiciary
SB0127 Vehicle Laws – Cats and Dogs Left Unattended – Authorized Removal Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0128 Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2020) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0412 Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0455 /CH0248 (HB0547/CH0247) Health - Maryland Children's Service Animal Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 248
Finance
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0626 Retail Pet Stores - Transportation of Cats and Dogs by Common Carrier - Prohibition Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0627 (HB0406) Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0925 Criminal Law - Dangerous and Potentially Dangerous Dogs - Classification and Requirements Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 2:06 PM