Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Domestic Violence -see also- Child Abuse & Neglect

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054 (SB0354)
Title
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0116 /CH0039 (SB0267/CH0038)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid Fraud
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 (SB0333)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0461 (SB0558)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Domestic Violence Center Ho. Co. 6-13
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0535
Title
Court Fees - Surcharge on Divorce Petitions - Distribution to the Domestic Violence Program Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0698)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0853 (SB0417)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0892 (SB0731)
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037 (SB0630)
Title
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1230 (SB0490)
Title
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief and Orders to Vacate Home
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1260
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Increased Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1340
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Baltimore City Sheriff and Fees for Filing and Service of Process
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0267 /CH0038 (HB0116/CH0039)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid Fraud
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0333 (HB0326)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354 (HB0054)
Title
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser Registry
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0417 (HB0853)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0490 (HB1230)
Title
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 (HB0461)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Domestic Violence Center
Sponsor
Howard County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0630 (HB1037)
Title
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698 (HB0735)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0731 (HB0892)
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0846 /CH0325
Title
Courts - Baltimore City Sheriff and Fees for Filing and Service of Process
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1024
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence Incident Report - Dissemination
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0054 (SB0354) Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser Registry Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0116 /CH0039 (SB0267/CH0038) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid Fraud Delegate Mitchell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Judiciary
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0326 (SB0333) Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0461 (SB0558) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Domestic Violence Center Ho. Co. 6-13 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB0535 Court Fees - Surcharge on Divorce Petitions - Distribution to the Domestic Violence Program Fund Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0735 (SB0698) Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0853 (SB0417) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0892 (SB0731) Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1037 (SB0630) Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1230 (SB0490) Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief and Orders to Vacate Home Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1259 Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1260 Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Increased Penalties Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1340 Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Baltimore City Sheriff and Fees for Filing and Service of Process Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0267 /CH0038 (HB0116/CH0039) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Abuse or Neglect of Vulnerable Adult and Medicaid Fraud Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0333 (HB0326) Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0354 (HB0054) Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser Registry Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0417 (HB0853) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders Senator Forehand 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0490 (HB1230) Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief Senator Shank 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0558 (HB0461) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Domestic Violence Center Howard County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0630 (HB1037) Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0698 (HB0735) Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0731 (HB0892) Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0846 /CH0325 Courts - Baltimore City Sheriff and Fees for Filing and Service of Process Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1024 Family Law - Domestic Violence Incident Report - Dissemination Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM