Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dorchester County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066 /CH0433 (SB0002/CH0432)
Title
Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - Sundays
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0068 /CH0445 (SB0149/CH0444)
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0069 /CH0007 (SB0006/CH0006)
Title
Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133 /CH0447 (SB0150/CH0446)
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0290 (SB0147)
Title
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0692 (SB0527)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational Center
Sponsor
Delegate Cane
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1477 (SB1021)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Sailwinds Wharf Development Project
Sponsor
Delegate Cane
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 /CH0432 (HB0066/CH0433)
Title
Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 /CH0006 (HB0069/CH0007)
Title
Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0147 (HB0290)
Title
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0149 /CH0444 (HB0068/CH0445)
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0150 /CH0446 (HB0133/CH0447)
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0527 (HB0692)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational Center
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789
Title
Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1021 (HB1477)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Sailwinds Wharf Development Project
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 /CH0433 (SB0002/CH0432) Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - Sundays Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0068 /CH0445 (SB0149/CH0444) Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0069 /CH0007 (SB0006/CH0006) Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Ways and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0133 /CH0447 (SB0150/CH0446) Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0290 (SB0147) Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement Caroline County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0692 (SB0527) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational Center Delegate Cane 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 3:00 PM
HB1477 (SB1021) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Sailwinds Wharf Development Project Delegate Cane 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 3:00 PM
SB0002 /CH0432 (HB0066/CH0433) Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - Sundays Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0006 /CH0006 (HB0069/CH0007) Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0147 (HB0290) Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement Senator Colburn 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0149 /CH0444 (HB0068/CH0445) Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0150 /CH0446 (HB0133/CH0447) Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0527 (HB0692) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational Center Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0789 Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1021 (HB1477) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Sailwinds Wharf Development Project Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM