Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dorchester County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297 /CH0054 (SB0051/CH0055)
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Festivals
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0298 /CH0056 (SB0140/CH0057)
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Per Diem Licenses - Catering Club Events
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0321 /CH0052 (SB0003/CH0053)
Title
Dorchester County - Hurlock - Alcoholic Beverages - Place-of-Worship or School Distance Restrictions
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0330 /CH0174 (SB0215/CH0175)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of Vienna
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 /CH0820 (SB0436/CH0821)
Title
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1275 (SB0710)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Maces Lane Community Center
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1367 (SB1040)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Patriot Point
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003 /CH0053 (HB0321/CH0052)
Title
Dorchester County - Hurlock - Alcoholic Beverages - Place-of-Worship or School Distance Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0051 /CH0055 (HB0297/CH0054)
Title
Dorchester County – Alcoholic Beverages – Beer and Wine Festivals
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0140 /CH0057 (HB0298/CH0056)
Title
Dorchester County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class C Per Diem Licenses – Catering Club Events
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215 /CH0175 (HB0330/CH0174)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of Vienna
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 /CH0821 (HB0554/CH0820)
Title
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries
Sponsor
Caroline County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0710 (HB1275)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Maces Lane Community Center
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1040 (HB1367)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Patriot Point
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1056 /CH0606
Title
Rural Health Collaborative Pilot
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0297 /CH0054 (SB0051/CH0055) Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Festivals Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0298 /CH0056 (SB0140/CH0057) Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Per Diem Licenses - Catering Club Events Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0321 /CH0052 (SB0003/CH0053) Dorchester County - Hurlock - Alcoholic Beverages - Place-of-Worship or School Distance Restrictions Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0330 /CH0174 (SB0215/CH0175) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of Vienna Delegate Mautz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0554 /CH0820 (SB0436/CH0821) Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries Caroline County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1275 (SB0710) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Maces Lane Community Center Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
HB1367 (SB1040) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Patriot Point Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 12:00 PM
SB0003 /CH0053 (HB0321/CH0052) Dorchester County - Hurlock - Alcoholic Beverages - Place-of-Worship or School Distance Restrictions Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0051 /CH0055 (HB0297/CH0054) Dorchester County – Alcoholic Beverages – Beer and Wine Festivals Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0140 /CH0057 (HB0298/CH0056) Dorchester County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class C Per Diem Licenses – Catering Club Events Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0215 /CH0175 (HB0330/CH0174) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of Vienna Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0436 /CH0821 (HB0554/CH0820) Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries Caroline County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0710 (HB1275) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Maces Lane Community Center Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1040 (HB1367) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Patriot Point Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 4:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 4:00 PM
SB1056 /CH0606 Rural Health Collaborative Pilot Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM