Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dorchester County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 (SB0442)
Title
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212 (SB0107)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges and Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Consent Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0311 /CH0627 (SB0111/CH0628)
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Licenses
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0513 (SB1002)
Title
County Boards of Education – Establishing Regional Career and Technology Education Schools – Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618 /CH0190 (SB0889/CH0191)
Title
Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0619 /CH0192 (SB0890/CH0193)
Title
Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Muzzle Loader Season
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0620 /CH0188 (SB0888/CH0189)
Title
Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Firearms Season
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1358
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 (HB0212)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges and Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Consent Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0111 /CH0628 (HB0311/CH0627)
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442 (HB0102)
Title
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0888 /CH0189 (HB0620/CH0188)
Title
Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Firearms Season
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0889 /CH0191 (HB0618/CH0190)
Title
Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0890 /CH0193 (HB0619/CH0192)
Title
Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Muzzle Loader Season
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1002 (HB0513)
Title
County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 (SB0442) Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0212 (SB0107) Anne Arundel County - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges and Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Consent Requirement Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0311 /CH0627 (SB0111/CH0628) Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Licenses Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 627
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0513 (SB1002) County Boards of Education – Establishing Regional Career and Technology Education Schools – Authority Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0618 /CH0190 (SB0889/CH0191) Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season Delegate Adams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0619 /CH0192 (SB0890/CH0193) Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Muzzle Loader Season Delegate Adams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0620 /CH0188 (SB0888/CH0189) Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Firearms Season Delegate Adams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0840 Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1358 Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0107 (HB0212) Anne Arundel County - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges and Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Consent Requirement Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0111 /CH0628 (HB0311/CH0627) Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Licenses Senator Eckardt 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 628
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0442 (HB0102) Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0888 /CH0189 (HB0620/CH0188) Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Firearms Season Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2019 - 10:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0889 /CH0191 (HB0618/CH0190) Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2019 - 10:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0890 /CH0193 (HB0619/CH0192) Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Muzzle Loader Season Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2019 - 10:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB1002 (HB0513) County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority and Funding Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:22 PM