Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dredging

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155 (SB0466)
Title
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1451
Title
Environment - Marine Contractor Services - License Exceptions
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1539 (SB1096)
Title
Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0006 (SJ0004)
Title
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - Dredging
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0466 (HB1155)
Title
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1096 (HB1539)
Title
Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation Plan
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0004 (HJ0006)
Title
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - Dredging
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1155 (SB0466) Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1451 Environment - Marine Contractor Services - License Exceptions Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1539 (SB1096) Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation Plan Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0006 (SJ0004) Conowingo Dam - Sediment - Dredging Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0466 (HB1155) Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge Senator Dyson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1096 (HB1539) Maryland Port Administration - Chesapeake and Delaware Canal - Dredged Material Containment Areas - Remediation Plan Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SJ0004 (HJ0006) Conowingo Dam - Sediment - Dredging Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM