Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dredging

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001 (SB0145)
Title
Natural Resources - Prohibition on Dredging Buried Oyster Shells on Man-O-War Shoals
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0040
Title
Dredging on Man-O-War Shoals - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054
Title
Natural Resources - Lands Formed by Excavation Materials - Transfer of Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0145 (HB0001)
Title
Natural Resources - Prohibition on Dredging Buried Oyster Shells on Man-O-War Shoals
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 /CH0272
Title
Waterway Improvement Fund - Public Boating Construction Projects - Financing Limits
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0001 (SB0145) Natural Resources - Prohibition on Dredging Buried Oyster Shells on Man-O-War Shoals Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2019 - 2:30 PM
HB0040 Dredging on Man-O-War Shoals - Prohibition Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2019 - 2:30 PM
HB0054 Natural Resources - Lands Formed by Excavation Materials - Transfer of Authority Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
SB0145 (HB0001) Natural Resources - Prohibition on Dredging Buried Oyster Shells on Man-O-War Shoals Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 /CH0272 Waterway Improvement Fund - Public Boating Construction Projects - Financing Limits Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:22 PM